Global Patent Index - EP 1160099 A2

EP 1160099 A2 2001-12-05 - Sheet treating apparatus

Title (en)

Sheet treating apparatus

Title (de)

Bogenverarbeitungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traitement de feuilles

Publication

EP 1160099 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01112793 A

Priority

JP 2000157888 A

Abstract (en)

A sheet treating apparatus (129) including a stacking tray (130) having a stacking surface for receiving and stacking sheets thereon and a stopper portion (131) for regulating the end portions of the sheets, a delivery rotary member (7) for delivering the sheets to the stacking tray, an endless belt member (190) contacting with and acting on the upper surface of the sheets on the stacking tray, and feeding the delivered sheet so as to pull the end portion thereof into the stopper portion, and a traction device (196) for pulling a portion of the endless belt member in a predetermined direction, wherein during the feed of the sheet caused by the endless belt member, the traction device is operated in conformity with the height of the sheets stacked on the stacking tray to thereby control the contact pressure of the endless belt member against the sheets stacked on the stacking tray so as to become substantially constant. The stacking tray is inclined so that the downstream side thereof in the delivery direction of the sheet may become higher, and the delivered sheet is switched back to return with the direction thereof changed over, and the stopper portion is provided on the downstream side in the direction of return of the sheet. The endless belt member is supported with a portion of its inner peripheral surface twined around the delivery rotary member and is rotated with the delivery rotary member. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42C 1/12; B65H 29/14; B65H 31/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/34 (2006.01); B42C 1/12 (2006.01); B65H 31/26 (2006.01); B65H 31/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/3027 (2013.01); B42C 1/12 (2013.01); B65H 31/36 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42262 (2013.01); B65H 2404/255 (2013.01); B65H 2404/265 (2013.01); B65H 2801/27 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160099 A2 20011205; EP 1160099 A3 20031210; EP 1160099 B1 20061011; DE 60123702 D1 20061123; DE 60123702 T2 20070830; JP 2001335227 A 20011204; JP 3728178 B2 20051221; US 2002008350 A1 20020124; US 6702279 B2 20040309

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60123702 P 20061123

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061011

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050309

2004-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040608

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI