Global Patent Index - EP 1160130 A2

EP 1160130 A2 2001-12-05 - Vehicular mirror

Title (en)

Vehicular mirror

Title (de)

Fahrzeugspiegel

Title (fr)

Rétroviseur de véhicule

Publication

EP 1160130 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01304057 A

Priority

US 58005600 A

Abstract (en)

A vehicular mirror 12 having a first curved portion 18 and a second substantially planar portion 16. The first curved portion 18 is deployed in close proximity to the vehicle 10, thereby substantially eliminating the conventional "blind spot" while concomitantly providing a relatively wide field of view.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 1/082 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4331382 A 19820525 - GRAFF HENRY W

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160130 A2 20011205; EP 1160130 A3 20060201; US 2004027697 A1 20040212; US 6932483 B2 20050823

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-28 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080418

2006-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061110

2006-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2006-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060624

2006-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-02-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI