Global Patent Index - EP 1160139 A2

EP 1160139 A2 2001-12-05 - Fluid-tight support for vehicles

Title (en)

Fluid-tight support for vehicles

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsdichter Fahrzeugstandplatz

Title (fr)

Support étanche pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1160139 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112532 A

Priority

DE 20009681 U

Abstract (en)

Liquid-tight vehicle parking place comprises a supporting frame (10) consisting of longitudinal and transverse beams (11-16) made from steel, permeable bearing surface elements (18) placed on the beams, and non-supporting drip pans (19) fixed between the beams. Preferred Features: The beams are open or closed hollow profiles filled with foamed material.

Abstract (de)

Der Fahrzeugstandplatz dient zum Auffangen von Öl und anderen Flüssigkeiten, die den Boden verunreinigen könnten. Er weist einen tragenden Rahmen aus fest miteinander verbundenen längslaufenden Holmen (11,12,15,16) und querlaufenden Holmen (13,14) aus Stahl auf. Auf den Holmen liegen durchlässige Tragflächenelemente (18) in Form von Gitterrosten oder Betonfertigteilplatten auf. Zwischen den Holmen des Rahmens (10) sind nichttragende Auffangbleche (19) befestigt, die jeweils schräg verlaufen und zu einem Ablauf (21) führen. Der Rahmen (10) hat eine geringe Bauhöhe und ein geringes Gewicht. Die Holme sind vorzugsweise als Hohlprofile ausgebildet und mit Schaumstoff ausgeschäumt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60S 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20009681 U1 20011108; EP 1160139 A2 20011205; EP 1160139 A3 20030917

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI