Global Patent Index - EP 1160173 A2

EP 1160173 A2 2001-12-05 - A closure member for a container

Title (en)

A closure member for a container

Title (de)

Verschluss für einen Behälter

Title (fr)

Couvercle pour récipient

Publication

EP 1160173 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01304699 A

Priority

GB 0013293 A

Abstract (en)

A tamper evident closure member 10 for storage containers, such as salt container, comprising a lid portion 12 and a wall portion 14, wherein the wall portion 14 is attached around the circumference of the lid portion 12, extending generally perpendicular away from the lid portion 12. At least one opening 16 is provided through the lid portion 12, and the, or each, opening 16 is closeable by a tab member 18 that is pivotably moveable between respective open and closed positions. <??>A lock member 24 associated with the, or each, tab member 18, is detachably attached to the closure member 10 so that it engages the respective tab member 18, locking the tab member 18 in its closed position, until the lock member 24 is permanently detached from the closure member 10. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 55/02; B65D 47/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/089 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0015 (2013.01); B65D 2251/1008 (2013.01); B65D 2251/1041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160173 A2 20011205; EP 1160173 A3 20040630; GB 0013293 D0 20000726; GB 2362878 A 20011205; ZA 200104412 B 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051011

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-04-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050218

2005-03-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 55/02 A

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 47/08 B

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI