Global Patent Index - EP 1160176 A2

EP 1160176 A2 2001-12-05 - A cover laminate for a packaging

Title (en)

A cover laminate for a packaging

Title (de)

Decklaminat für eine Verpackung

Title (fr)

Stratifié de recouvrement pour un emballage

Publication

EP 1160176 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01113233 A

Priority

SE 0002021 A

Abstract (en)

A cover laminate for forming a resealable cover (3) for a packaging has a lower part (1) with an edge portion (2) for attaching the cover. The cover laminate comprises as a prefabricated unit a material sheet (4), preferably a plastic film, provided on its underside with a resealable adhesive (8) in a pattern generally corresponding to the shape of the edge portion (2) of the lower part. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/2096 (2013.01); B65D 77/204 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160176 A2 20011205; EP 1160176 A3 20020403; SE 0002021 D0 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050207

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020907

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI