Global Patent Index - EP 1160184 A2

EP 1160184 A2 2001-12-05 - Single transmission state media handling for ejecting, picking and loading

Title (en)

Single transmission state media handling for ejecting, picking and loading

Title (de)

Handhabung eines Aufzeichnungsträgers mittels eines einzigen Antriebs für Ausstossen, Aufnehmen und Vorlegen

Title (fr)

Manipulation de supports d'impression à transmission unique pour éjecter, prélever et charger

Publication

EP 1160184 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01105107 A

Priority

US 58749000 A

Abstract (en)

Time between recording print on one media sheet and a subsequent media sheet is substantially reduced by ejecting, picking and loading within a single transmission state. In a continuous feed mode multi-sheet job, individual media sheets (M) are continuously picked and loaded. The leading edge of one media sheet is substantially adjacent to the trailing edge of the prior media sheet. A media support plate (36) is maintained in a raised position during the entire continuous feed cycle. The support plate biases a paper stack (39) into communication with a pick roller (22). As the trailing edge of one media sheet exits the media stack, the leading edge of the next media sheet is already in position for engagement with the pick roller. Upon completion of print recording, a media sheet is ejected into an output tray (21) by accelerating the media sheet. Such acceleration is achieved while remaining in the single transmission state. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/06; B65H 5/06; B65H 5/34; B65H 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/06 (2006.01); B65H 5/06 (2006.01); B65H 5/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/34 (2013.01); B65H 3/0669 (2013.01); B65H 3/0676 (2013.01); B65H 5/06 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4451 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); B65H 2513/20 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02
  2. B65H 2513/20 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160184 A2 20011205; EP 1160184 A3 20030716; EP 1160184 B1 20050615; DE 60111456 D1 20050721; DE 60111456 T2 20060511; JP 2001341867 A 20011211; JP 3805999 B2 20060809; US 6325559 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140302

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60111456

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140302

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60111456

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P., HOU, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEWLETT-PACKARD CO. (N.D.GES.D.STAATES DELAWARE), PALO ALTO, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 60111456

- Effective date: 20120611

2012-08-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60111456

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20120611

2012-06-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60111456

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2012-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120329 AND 20120404

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60111456 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI