Global Patent Index - EP 1160189 A2

EP 1160189 A2 2001-12-05 - Device and method for monitoring the processing of rolls in print shops

Title (en)

Device and method for monitoring the processing of rolls in print shops

Title (de)

Anordnung und Verfahren zur Überwachung der Rollenverarbeitung in Druckereien

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour la surveillance du traitement de rouleaux dans des imprimeries

Publication

EP 1160189 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01110729 A

Priority

DE 10027130 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement monitors the operation of the rollers in printing systems having a printed matter roll (12), esp. a paper roll, comprising a core (16) and a strip of paper (18) wound thereon. The arrangement also includes an information carrier (10) for storing roll data. It also has a processor unit (14) for reading out and processing the roll data. The information carrier is arranged on the core, in its interior or end region so as to be accessible from outside the core sleeve around which the paper is wrapped. Independent claims also cover a method for monitoring the rolls.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anordnung und ein Verfahren zur Überwachung der Rollenverarbeitung in Druckereien. Dabei werden Papierrollen (12), die eine Kernhülse (16) und eine darauf aufgewickelte Papierbahn (18) aufweisen, mit einem Informationsträger (10) zur Speicherung von Rollendaten versehen. Weiter ist einer Verarbeitungseinrichtung (14) zum Auslesen und Verarbeiten der Rollendaten vorgesehen. Um eine einfache Bestückung auch im späteren Verarbeitungsprozeß nach der Rollenherstellung zu ermöglichen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß der Informationsträger (10) an der Kernhülse (16) in deren Innenraum (20) oder Endbereich (34) außerhalb des von der Papierbahn (18) überdeckten Kernhülsenmantels (36) zugänglich angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/00; B65H 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/28 (2013.01); B65H 2701/12422 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160189 A2 20011205; EP 1160189 A3 20040407; DE 10027130 A1 20011206

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-02-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 18/00 A

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 26/00 B

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI