Global Patent Index - EP 1160190 A2

EP 1160190 A2 2001-12-05 - Driving system for buiding lift

Title (en)

Driving system for buiding lift

Title (de)

Antriebssystem für Bau-Aufzug

Title (fr)

Système d'entrainement pour ascenseur de chantier

Publication

EP 1160190 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114726 A

Priority

DE 10025074 A

Abstract (en)

The lift comprises a passenger cage (106) driven by a cable winch fixed thereto. A support cable is installed on the structure and the cage is moved up and down when the cable winch is turned through the force locking connection between the winch and support cable so that the cage is moved along the support cable. A guide carriage fixed on the cage has guide rollers which roll on the side bars of a climbing ladder (100).

Abstract (de)

Einrichtung zum Befördern von Personen entlang eines Bauwerks relativ großer Höhe umfassend einen die Person aufnehmenden Fahrkorb sowie eine leiterähnliche Führungseinrichtung, wobei als Antrieb für den Fahrkorb (106) eine am Fahrkorb befestigte Seilwinde dient, wobei ein am Bauwerk installiertes Tragseil vorgesehen ist und die Aufwärts- beziehungsweise Abwärtsbewegung des Fahrkorbs (106) bei Drehung der Seilwinde durch Kraftschluss zwischen der Seilwinde und dem Tragseil erzielt wird, so dass sich der Fahrkorb entlang des Tragseils bewegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 9/187

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/187 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/187 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160190 A2 20011205; EP 1160190 A3 20040407; DE 10025074 A1 20011129; DE 10025074 B4 20061109

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041008

2005-02-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI