Global Patent Index - EP 1160226 A2

EP 1160226 A2 2001-12-05 - Process for manufacturing a soil conditioner from cellulose containing materials

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing a soil conditioner from cellulose containing materials

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Hertellung von Bodenhilfsstoffen aus cellulosehaltigem Material

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un agent d'amélioration du sol à base d'un materiau contenant de la cellulose

Publication

EP 1160226 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01107323 A

Priority

DE 10021319 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10021319A1] A peat substitute is produced from cellulose-containing material by processing to a fibrous material containing 20-60% solids, converting this material into a fleece-like material and drying the latter. Production of the peat substitute (F1) comprises: (a) processing a comminuted and dried cellulose-containing material (M) to a fibrous material (F2) having a high consistency and 20-60% solid content; (b) converting (F2) into a voluminous flock-like material (F3); and (c) drying (F3) to (F1).

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren dient zur Herstellung von torfähnlichen Bodenhilfsstoffen aus cellulosehaltigem Material, z.B. Altpapier, Zellstoff oder Holzstücken. Aus dem Rohstoff wird zunächst ein hochkonsistenter Faserstoff (F1) mit einem Feststoffgehalt zwischen 20 % und 60 % hergestellt, dieser dann zu einem feuchten, voluminösen, flockigen Stoff (F2) umgewandelt und anschließend getrocknet. Der so hergestellte Boden hilfsstoff (F3) eignet sich zur Verbesserung von Böden im Gartenbau und in der Landwirtschaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C05F 11/00; C05F 9/00; C05F 9/02; C05G 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C05F 9/00 (2006.01); C05F 9/02 (2006.01); C05F 11/00 (2006.01); C05G 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C05F 9/00 (2013.01); C05F 9/02 (2013.01); C05F 11/00 (2013.01); C05G 3/04 (2013.01); Y02A 40/214 (2018.01); Y02A 40/215 (2018.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10021319 A1 20011108; EP 1160226 A2 20011205; EP 1160226 A3 20020424

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100608

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-01-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI