Global Patent Index - EP 1160308 A2

EP 1160308 A2 2001-12-05 - Grease composition preventing flaking

Title (en)

Grease composition preventing flaking

Title (de)

Schmierfettzusammensetzung mit Antiflockungseigenschaften

Title (fr)

Composition de graisse ayant des propriétés antifloculantes

Publication

EP 1160308 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01304807 A

Priority

JP 2000166152 A

Abstract (en)

A grease composition comprising a lubricant base oil and a metal dithiocarbamate represented by the formula (1): <CHEM> wherein R<1> to R<4> may be the same or different and each stands for a hydrocarbon group having 10 to 20 carbon atoms, and X stands for a metal or a metal-containing group. The composition has long life even when used at a high temperature, is not harmful to humans and the environment, and can give an extended anti-flaking life to the rolling bearing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 135/18; C10M 169/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 135/18 (2006.01); C10M 169/00 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 10/08 (2006.01); C10N 10/10 (2006.01); C10N 10/12 (2006.01); C10N 10/16 (2006.01); C10N 30/08 (2006.01); C10N 40/02 (2006.01); C10N 50/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 135/18 (2013.01); C10M 105/18 (2013.01); C10M 105/38 (2013.01); C10M 119/24 (2013.01); C10M 133/12 (2013.01); C10M 169/00 (2013.01); C10M 2201/041 (2013.01); C10M 2201/042 (2013.01); C10M 2201/065 (2013.01); C10M 2201/066 (2013.01); C10M 2201/08 (2013.01); C10M 2201/081 (2013.01); C10M 2201/082 (2013.01); C10M 2201/084 (2013.01); C10M 2201/085 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2201/105 (2013.01); C10M 2205/026 (2013.01); C10M 2205/04 (2013.01); C10M 2207/021 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/04 (2013.01); C10M 2207/0406 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2835 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2209/00 (2013.01); C10M 2209/02 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10M 2209/10 (2013.01); C10M 2211/06 (2013.01); C10M 2213/02 (2013.01); C10M 2213/062 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/066 (2013.01); C10M 2215/067 (2013.01); C10M 2215/068 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/102 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2217/042 (2013.01); C10M 2217/043 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/024 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/082 (2013.01); C10M 2219/10 (2013.01); C10M 2219/102 (2013.01); C10M 2219/104 (2013.01); C10M 2219/106 (2013.01); C10M 2219/108 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10N 2210/00 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2210/03 (2013.01); C10N 2210/04 (2013.01); C10N 2210/05 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01); C10N 2210/08 (2013.01); C10N 2240/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160308 A2 20011205; EP 1160308 A3 20021204; JP 2001342483 A 20011214; JP 4620219 B2 20110126; US 2002013232 A1 20020131

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020601

2003-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI