Global Patent Index - EP 1160311 A2

EP 1160311 A2 2001-12-05 - Perfume delivery system

Title (en)

Perfume delivery system

Title (de)

Riechstofffreisetzungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de diffusion de parfum

Publication

EP 1160311 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01119868 A

Priority

  • EP 96932242 A
  • US 387195 P

Abstract (en)

Glassy particles containing perfume on a carrier material useful for laundry and cleaning products, and laundry and cleaning products containing these glassy particles. The particles comprise a glass derived from one or more at least partially water-soluble hydroxylic compounds, selected from polysaccharides and starches. The glassy particle also has a hygroscopicity value of less than about 80%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/50; C11D 3/22; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/221 (2013.01); C11D 3/50 (2013.01); C11D 3/505 (2013.01); C11D 17/0034 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9711151 A1 19970327; AR 003611 A1 19980805; AT 214729 T 20020415; AT 321119 T 20060415; BR 9610507 A 19990504; CA 2232466 A1 19970327; CA 2232466 C 20021231; CN 1191349 C 20050302; CN 1202196 A 19981216; CZ 292948 B6 20040114; CZ 9800719 A3 19980812; DE 69620003 D1 20020425; DE 69620003 T2 20021121; DE 69620003 T3 20061130; DE 69635936 D1 20060511; DE 69635936 T2 20061228; EP 0859828 A1 19980826; EP 0859828 B1 20020320; EP 0859828 B2 20060614; EP 1160311 A2 20011205; EP 1160311 A3 20020320; EP 1160311 B1 20060322; ES 2174105 T3 20021101; ES 2174105 T5 20070301; ES 2261305 T3 20061116; HU 9802268 A2 19990128; HU 9802268 A3 20000328; JP 4121556 B2 20080723; JP H11512482 A 19991026; MX 9802141 A 19980531

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160912

2016-10-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160912

2016-09-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69635936

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090916

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100913

2011-04-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090917

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060913

2008-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060623

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2261305 T3

2006-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060913

2006-08-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060822

2006-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-06-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69635936 P 20060511

2006-04-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0859828 P

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-03-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 11D 17/00 A, 7C 11D 3/50 B, 7C 11D 3/22 B

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SURUTZIDIS, ATHANASIOS

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RIZZI, GEORGE PETER

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KVIETOK, FRANK ANDREJ

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COOK, THOMAS EDWARD

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHOWELL, MICHAEL STANFORD

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURCKETT-ST.LAURENT, JAMES CHARLES

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOSSELINK, EUGENE PAUL

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WATSON, RANDALL ALAN

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SURUTZIDIS, ATHANASIOS

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RIZZI, GEORGE PETER

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KVIETOK, FRANK ANDREJ

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COOK, THOMAS EDWARD

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHOWELL, MICHAEL STANFORD

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURCKETT-ST.LAURENT, JAMES CHARLES

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOSSELINK, EUGENE PAUL

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WATSON, RANDALL ALAN

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-12-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 859828

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE