Global Patent Index - EP 1160341 A2

EP 1160341 A2 2001-12-05 - Process and apparatus for hardening rails

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for hardening rails

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Härten von Schienen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le durcissement de rails

Publication

EP 1160341 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01890152 A

Priority

AT 9392000 A

Abstract (en)

Process for hardening rails or a rail head comprises: leveling the rails in the austenitic state; and horizontally positioning and clamping to prevent bending. While maintaining the clamping position, the rails and/or a part of the rail cross-section are partially cooled from a temperature which lies above the Ac3 point of the alloy converting the structure from an austenitic structure to a room temperature stable microstructure. An Independent claim is also included for a device for hardening rails or a rail head comprising a rail supporting device formed as a support (2) with a longitudinal extension corresponding to the rail with positioning elements (3) and detachable clamps (4) for holding the rail.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung befaßt sich mit einem Verfahren und einer Einrichtung zum Härten von Schienen oder zumindest des Schienenkopfes derselben durch verstärkte Kühlung mit einem Umwandeln des Gefüges von der austenitischen in eine gewünschte bei Raumtemperatur stabile Mikrostruktur. Um über die Schienenlänge eine gleichbleibende Gefügeverteilung im Schienenquerschnitt zu erreichen und hohe Schienengüte sicherzustellen, ist erfindungsgemäß verfahrenstechnisch vorgesehen, daß die Schiene im austenitischen Gefügezustand gerichtet, horizontal positioniert und achsfluchtend gegen Biegung gesichert eingespannt wird, worauf unter Aufrechterhaltung der Einspannung bzw. Verbiegungssicherung die Schiene und/oder zumindest ein Teil des Schienenquierschnittes von einer Temperatur, welche oberhalb des AC3-Punktes der Legierung liegt, in an sich bekannter Weise zumindest zeitweise verstärkt abgekühlt und das Gefüge umwandeln gelassen werden. Die erfindungsgemäße Einrichtung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das Schienenstützmittel als Tragkonstruktion (2) mit einer der Schiene (1) entsprechenden Längserstreckung und mit hohem Widerstandsmoment gegen Biegung sowie mit Positionierelementen (3) und/oder lösbaren Spannmitteln (4) für eine Festlegung der Schiene (1) gebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/04 (2006.01); C21D 9/06 (2006.01); C21D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/06 (2013.01); C21D 1/02 (2013.01); C21D 2221/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160341 A2 20011205; EP 1160341 A3 20040102; EP 1160341 B1 20051012; AT 409268 B 20020725; AT A9392000 A 20011115; AU 4618701 A 20011206; AU 778188 B2 20041118; BR 0102154 A 20020213; BR 0102154 B1 20110222; CA 2349321 A1 20011129; CA 2349321 C 20100126; CN 1180097 C 20041215; CN 1327074 A 20011219; CZ 20011818 A3 20020213; CZ 299001 B6 20080402; DE 50107654 D1 20051117; DK 1160341 T3 20060227; ES 2247050 T3 20060301; HR P20010411 A2 20011231; HR P20010411 B1 20110331; HU 0102212 A2 20020128; HU 0102212 A3 20030630; HU 0102212 D0 20010828; HU 223348 B1 20040628; JP 2002047516 A 20020215; PL 197258 B1 20080331; PL 347667 A1 20011203; RU 2226557 C2 20040410; SK 286764 B6 20090507; SK 7202001 A3 20011203; TW 499335 B 20020821; UA 76693 C2 20011217; US 6432230 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100524

2011-04-20 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110415

2011-04-13 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20110120

2011-04-13 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20110120

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100523

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101202

2011-03-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101122

2011-02-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100522

2011-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100522

2011-01-17 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOESTALPINE SCHIENEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-11-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20101122

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100611

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-07-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100518

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090518

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090511

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051012

2006-10-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CORUS UK LTD.

2006-08-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CORUS UK LTD.

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2247050 T3

2006-02-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-02-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050403850

2005-12-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-11-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50107654 P 20051117

2005-11-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-11-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051012

2005-10-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, VON REVY & PARTNER

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-10-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV MK RO SI

2005-10-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040405

- Countries: LT

2004-09-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040405

- Countries: LV

2004-09-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040405

- Countries: MK

2004-09-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040405

- Countries: RO

2004-09-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040405

- Countries: SI

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOESTALPINE SCHIENEN GMBH

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040510

2004-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI