Global Patent Index - EP 1160349 A1

EP 1160349 A1 2001-12-05 - Process and apparatus for heat treating of metallic workpieces

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for heat treating of metallic workpieces

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wärmebehandlung metallischer Werkstücke

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de traitement thermique de pièces métalliques

Publication

EP 1160349 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111129 A

Priority

EP 00111129 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for heat treating metallic workpieces comprises a heating chamber in which the workpieces are heated and subjected to a gas atmosphere containing nitrogen and a hydrocarbon; and devices for introducing nitrogen and hydrocarbons into the gas atmosphere depending on the carburizing index which represents the carbon content in the edge layer. An Independent claim is also included for a heat treatment process using the above apparatus. The apparatus preferably also has devices for introducing ammonia. The heating chamber is hermetically sealed and is flushed with an inert gas, preferably nitrogen.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zur Wärmebehandlung metallischer Werkstücke besteht aus folgenden Verfahrensschritten: a) Erwärmen der Werkstücke auf eine bestimmte Temperatur (<IMAGE>) in einer Stickstoff und einen Kohlenwasserstoff enthaltenden Gasatmosphäre während einer Aufheizphase (A), wobei die Zufuhr der Mengen an Stickstoff (V˙N2 ) und Kohlenwasserstoff (V˙C2H2) in die Gasatmosphäre derart geregelt wird, dass sich auf den Werkstücken eine Randschicht mit einem Kohlenstoffgehalt (wc) innerhalb eines vorgegebenen Bereichs bildet; b) Halten der Werkstücke auf der am Ende der Aufheizphase (A) erreichten Temperatur () für eine bestimmte Zeitdauer während einer sich anschließenden Ausgleichsphase (B), wobei durch die der Gasatmosphäre zugeführten Mengen an Stickstoff (V˙N2) und Kohlenwasserstoff (V˙C2H2) der Kohlenstoffgehalt (wc) der Randschicht weiterhin innerhalb des vorgegebenen Bereichs liegt; c) Variieren der Mengen an Stickstoff (V˙N2) und Kohlenwasserstoff (V˙C2H2) in der Gasatmosphäre während einer sich an die Ausgleichsphase (B) anschließenden Anreicherungsphase (C) und einer hierauf folgenden Diffusionsphase (D), wobei jeweils zunächst in einem ersten Abschnitt zum Erreichen einer vorgegebenen Obergrenze (Go) des Kohlenstoffgehalts (wc) der Randschicht der Anteil an Stickstoff (V˙N2) reduziert und der Anteil an Kohlenwasserstoff (VC2H2) erhöht wird und nachfolgend in einem zweiten Abschnitt zum Erreichen einer vorgegebenen Untergrenze (Gu) des Kohlenstoffgehalts (wc) der Randschicht der Anteil an Stickstoff (V˙N2 ) erhöht und der Anteil an Kohlenwasserstoff (V˙C2H2) reduziert wird; d) Abkühlen der Werkstücke auf Raumtemperatur während einer sich an die Diffusionsphase (D) anschließenden Abkühlungsphase (E). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 8/22; C23C 8/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/22 (2006.01); C23C 8/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/22 (2013.01); C23C 8/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160349 A1 20011205; EP 1160349 B1 20040818; AT 274073 T 20040915; DE 50007480 D1 20040923

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007480

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070524

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070524

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070524

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: IPSEN INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Free text: IPSEN INTERNATIONAL GMBH#FLUTSTRASSE 78#47533 KLEVE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- IPSEN INTERNATIONAL GMBH#FLUTSTRASSE 78#47533 KLEVE (DE)

2006-05-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-04-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041203

2004-11-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007480 P 20040923

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020625

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI