Global Patent Index - EP 1160353 A1

EP 1160353 A1 2001-12-05 - Coated cemented carbide cutting tool member and process for producing the same

Title (en)

Coated cemented carbide cutting tool member and process for producing the same

Title (de)

Beschichtetes Schneidwerkzeug aus zementiertem Karbid und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Outil de coupe en carbure fritté muni d'un revêtement et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1160353 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00111028 A

Priority

  • EP 00111028 A
  • US 58377300 A

Abstract (en)

A coated cemented carbide cutting tool member and a process for production thereof are disclosed. The coated cemented carbide cutting tool comprises a substrate and a hard coating layer deposited on said substrate by chemical vapor deposition and/or physical vapor deposition, wherein said hard coating layer has average thickness of 3 to 25 mu m, and comprises (1) at least one Ti compounds layer that is composed of at least one granular layer of TiC, TiN, TiCN, Ti2O3, TiCO, TiNO and TiCNO, whose average thickness is 0.1 to 5 mu m, (2) TiCN layer having longitudinal growth crystal structure whose average thickness is 2 to 15 mu m, and (3) Al2O3 layer whose average thickness is 0.5 to 8 mu m, wherein, said longitudinal TiCN layer has compositional gradient of carbon and nitrogen along with its growth direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 16/36; C23C 16/02; C23C 30/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 16/02 (2006.01); C23C 16/36 (2006.01); C23C 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 16/36 (2013.01); C23C 16/029 (2013.01); C23C 30/005 (2013.01); Y10T 407/27 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24942 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24975 (2013.01); Y10T 428/265 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160353 A1 20011205; EP 1160353 B1 20071212; AT 380890 T 20071215; US 6338894 B1 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071212

2009-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080313

2008-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080915

2008-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080512

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080323

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-03-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60037401 P 20080124

2008-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-12-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI