Global Patent Index - EP 1160358 A1

EP 1160358 A1 2001-12-05 - Electrolytic refining method of copper and electrolytic copper

Title (en)

Electrolytic refining method of copper and electrolytic copper

Title (de)

Elektrolytisches Kupferraffinationsverfahren und elektrolytisches Kupfer

Title (fr)

Procédé de raffinage électrolytique de cuivre et cuivre électrolytique

Publication

EP 1160358 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01113003 A

Priority

  • JP 2000158020 A
  • JP 2000219753 A
  • JP 2000328922 A
  • JP 2001105514 A

Abstract (en)

In an electrolytic refining method of copper, (1) electrolysis is operated by controlling the cathode potential at current density Dk of 330 A/m<2> or higher, and/or (2) electrolysis is operated by using an anion surfactant together with glue and thiourea as additives, and/or (3) PR electrolysis is operated by adding an anion surfactant to the electrolyte solution by 0.001 g /t or more, and feeding inverting or reversing current continuously for 45 to 300 seconds, at 1/500 to 1/25 of continuous feeding time of positive current.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25C 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160358 A1 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150519

2009-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081229

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020410

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI