Global Patent Index - EP 1160366 A2

EP 1160366 A2 2001-12-05 - Method for binding a yarn leading end and/or yarn trailing end in a knitted fabric

Title (en)

Method for binding a yarn leading end and/or yarn trailing end in a knitted fabric

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einbinden eines Strickfadenanfangs und/oder -endes in ein Gestrick

Title (fr)

Procédé pour relier un bout de commencement et/ou bout de fin d'un fil dans un tricot

Publication

EP 1160366 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01105617 A

Priority

DE 10026367 A

Abstract (en)

To bind the start and/or end of a knitting yarn at a knitted fabric (10), at a knitter, the leading (15,21,25) or trailing (20,26) ends of the yarn are floated over a number of needles. It is then laid as a yarn loop in certain needles, before knitting is resumed in the opposite direction, using the needles carrying the yarn loop in the same needle bed and the needles in the yarn float zone. To bind the ends of the knitting yarn in the knitted fabric, the leading or trailing end formed into a loop is laid into the final needles of the first yarn float zone, to be knitted into stitches. A number of stitches are knitted before the trailing end of the yarn is reversed to float over a number of needles. The leading and trailing ends of the yarn are bonded into the material at the fabric edges.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Einbinden eines Strickfadenanfangs (15, 21, 25) und/oder -endes (20, 26) in ein auf einer Strickmaschine hergestelltes Gestrick (10), sodass ein manuelles Einziehen der Strickfadenenden in das Gestrick entfallen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/126 (2013.01); D04B 1/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160366 A2 20011205; EP 1160366 A3 20021211; EP 1160366 B1 20060726; DE 10026367 A1 20011129; DE 50110520 D1 20060907; ES 2266036 T3 20070301

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110307

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090309

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090309

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080404

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080114

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2266036 T3

2006-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110520 P 20060907

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2006-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040727

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 04B 1/22 A, 7D 04B 1/10 B

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI