Global Patent Index - EP 1160367 A2

EP 1160367 A2 2001-12-05 - Matting of low density thermoplastic material and high voids index, and a device and process for its production

Title (en)

Matting of low density thermoplastic material and high voids index, and a device and process for its production

Title (de)

Fasermatte mit erhöhtem Hohlraumindex aus thermoplastischen Filamenten niedriger Dichte, Vorrichtung und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Matelas fibreux ayant un indice élevé d'espaces vides, à partir de filaments thermoplastiques de faible densité, installation et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1160367 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01201819 A

Priority

IT RE20000060 A

Abstract (en)

Matting of interlaced and entangled filaments of low-density thermoplastic material, the matting having a high voids index and comprising a plurality of hollow protuberances arranged in several parallel rows; at least a part of said protuberances presents at least one open portion, defined by non-interlaced filaments, such as to create a chamber for receiving the material with which the matting is intended to be covered; a plant and process for producing said matting. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 3/03; D04H 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/03 (2012.01); D04H 3/07 (2012.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/07 (2013.01); D04H 3/03 (2013.01); D04H 3/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160367 A2 20011205; EP 1160367 A3 20021030; EP 1160367 B1 20060215; AT 317923 T 20060315; DE 60117218 D1 20060420; DE 60117218 T2 20060727; DK 1160367 T3 20060619; ES 2256153 T3 20060716; IT 1319160 B1 20030926; IT RE20000060 A1 20011129; PT 1160367 E 20060531

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 317923 T

- Effective date: 20100228

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60117218

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-02-05 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20060400993

- Effective date: 20131204

2014-01-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060215

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060215

2014-01-27 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140122

2014-01-22 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100228

2014-01-22 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20100228

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 317923 T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-12-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131201

2013-11-22 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20131115

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120601

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110515

2011-08-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OFFICINE MACCAFERRI S.P.A.

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060215

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060515

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060215

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FARE' S.P.A.

2007-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TEMA - TECHNOLOGIES AND MATERIALS SRL

2007-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FARE' S.P.A.

2006-12-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FARE' S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20061113

2006-12-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TEMA - TECHNOLOGIES AND MATERIALS SRL

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-12-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FARE' S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20061113

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20060215

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2256153 T3

2006-06-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-05-29 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060400993

2006-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-05-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060515

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60117218 P 20060420

2006-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-02-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-02-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-02-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060215

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GREENVISION AMBIENTE S.P.A.

2004-03-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GREENVISION S.P.A.

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030422

- Countries: AL

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030422

- Countries: LT

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030422

- Countries: LV

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030422

- Countries: MK

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030422

- Countries: RO

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030422

- Countries: SI

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI