Global Patent Index - EP 1160373 A2

EP 1160373 A2 2001-12-05 - Polymer dispersion with improved biodegradability

Title (en)

Polymer dispersion with improved biodegradability

Title (de)

Polymerdispersion mit verbesserter biologischer Abbaubarkeit

Title (fr)

Dispersion de polymère à biodégradabilité améliorée

Publication

EP 1160373 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112429 A

Priority

DE 10027016 A

Abstract (en)

Polymer dispersions (I) containing polymer(s) and a synthetic carrier medium based on biodegradable components (BDC) or a mixture of BDC or a mixture of one or more BDC with one or more less biodegradable components. An Independent claim is also included for printing paste containing water, a dispersion (I) and pigments(s).

Abstract (de)

Die Polymerdispersion enthält ein oder mehrere Polymere und ein synthetisches Trägermedium auf der Basis einer biologisch abbaubaren Komponente oder einer Mischung biologisch abbaubarer Komponenten oder einer Mischung einer oder mehrerer biologisch abbaubarer Komponenten mit einer oder mehrerer weniger gut abbaubaren Komponenten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06P 1/52; C08K 5/10; C08L 33/00; D06P 1/651

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/52 (2006.01); D06P 1/651 (2006.01); D06P 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 5/001 (2013.01); D06P 1/5214 (2013.01); D06P 1/5228 (2013.01); D06P 1/5242 (2013.01); D06P 1/525 (2013.01); D06P 1/5257 (2013.01); D06P 1/65125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160373 A2 20011205; EP 1160373 A3 20040331; EP 1160373 B1 20060301; DE 10027016 A1 20011220; DE 50109033 D1 20060427; EG 22646 A 20030531; US 2002035181 A1 20020321; US 6696508 B2 20040224

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-08 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080916

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060301

2007-01-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LANXESS B.V/LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109033 P 20060427

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE NL TR

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-09-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: THICKENER COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED BIODEGRADABILITY

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE NL TR

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06P 1/52 A

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06P 1/651 B

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08K 5/10 B

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08L 33/00 B

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI