Global Patent Index - EP 1160375 A2

EP 1160375 A2 2001-12-05 - Method and device for varying the basis weight in a paper machine headbox

Title (en)

Method and device for varying the basis weight in a paper machine headbox

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Variieren des Flächengewichts im Stoffauflauf einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la variation du poids de base dans une caisse de tête d'une machine à papier

Publication

EP 1160375 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01113119 A

Priority

IT VI20000116 A

Abstract (en)

A method of varying the basis weight of the fibrous suspension coming out from a head box of a paper making machine is disclosed, wherein said variation of basis weight is obtained by extraction of controlled quantities of fibrous suspension from said head box. The head box (1) carrying out said variation of basis weight comprises a perforated plate (2) with a plurality of troughs (3) and a delivery chamber (6) ending with a slice (7) arranged above a movable filtering surface (F). One or more of said troughs (3) communicate with at least a suction pipe (8) connected to suction means (9) for extracting variable quantities of fibrous suspension. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02; D21F 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01); D21F 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/026 (2013.01); D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01); D21F 1/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160375 A2 20011205; EP 1160375 A3 20020306; IT 1315355 B1 20030210; IT VI20000116 A1 20011130; IT VI20000116 D0 20000530

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-01-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI