Global Patent Index - EP 1160376 A2

EP 1160376 A2 2001-12-05 - Suction box for paper making machines

Title (en)

Suction box for paper making machines

Title (de)

Saugkasten für Papiermaschinen

Title (fr)

Caisse aspirante pour machines à papier

Publication

EP 1160376 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01113132 A

Priority

IT VI20000115 A

Abstract (en)

A suction box (1) for drying a film containing suspended cellulose fibers (3) spread on the upper side of a filtering surface (2) of a paper making machine is disclosed, comprising a plurality of generally vertical ducts (4) provided with openings (A) directed to the lower side (2b) of the filtering surface (2). The ducts (4) comprise a plurality of first ducts (5) with corresponding first openings (5a) for feeding a heating fluid against the filtering surface (2) and a plurality of second ducts (6) with corresponding second openings (6a) for a suction action at the filtering surface (2). Each first duct (5) is coupled to a corresponding second duct (6) so as to arrange each first opening (5a) adjacent to a corresponding second opening (6a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/48; D21F 1/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/48 (2006.01); D21F 1/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/48 (2013.01); D21F 1/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160376 A2 20011205; EP 1160376 A3 20020508; IT 1315354 B1 20030210; IT VI20000115 A1 20011130; IT VI20000115 D0 20000530

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-03-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI