Global Patent Index - EP 1160382 A1

EP 1160382 A1 2001-12-05 - Manhole cover with theft-prevention device

Title (en)

Manhole cover with theft-prevention device

Title (de)

Einstiegschacht mit angelenktem Deckel und Diebstahlsicherungsvorrichtung für eine Ausschachtung im Boden

Title (fr)

Regard à couvercle articulé à dispositif antivol, pour excavation de sol

Publication

EP 1160382 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01470014 A

Priority

FR 0007034 A

Abstract (en)

The manhole cover (3), fitted into a surrounding frame (1) set in a road surface to give access to an inspection chamber, is hinged by means of a lug (30) on the lid engaging with a cavity (10) in the frame. The frame cavity contains a stop plate (4) for the head of the hinge lug, limiting the movement of the cover in the direction of the cavity wall (11) and preventing unauthorised withdrawal of the lug and cover.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2006.01); E02D 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/1463 (2013.01); E02D 29/14 (2013.01); E02D 29/1418 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160382 A1 20011205; EP 1160382 B1 20050907; AR 031240 A1 20030917; AT 304085 T 20050915; BR 0102215 A 20020213; BR 0102215 B1 20090113; DE 60113185 D1 20051013; DE 60113185 T2 20060608; DK 1160382 T3 20060123; ES 2248263 T3 20060316; FR 2809752 A1 20011207; FR 2809752 B1 20020719; ZA 200104303 B 20011128

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170602

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170413

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170509

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120517

2013-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-02-06 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20050402694

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-01-21 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2013-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 304085 T

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121201

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2248263 T3

2006-01-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-11-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-11-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050402694

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60113185 P 20051013

2005-10-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2005-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2005-09-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020515

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI