Global Patent Index - EP 1160383 A1

EP 1160383 A1 2001-12-05 - Device for controlling a series of washroom appliances

Title (en)

Device for controlling a series of washroom appliances

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Steuern einer Gruppe von Badezimmergeräten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour commander une série d'appareils pour salle d'eau

Publication

EP 1160383 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01202252 A

Priority

  • EP 01202252 A
  • EP 97200527 A
  • EP 96200513 A

Abstract (en)

A device for automatically controlling the operation of a washroom appliance such as a water faucet, soap dispenser, shower, urinal, etc., comprising means for actuating said appliance, means for deactuating said appliance, a remote control arranged for emitting a signal, a receiver arranged for receiving said signal and for generating a maintenance signal in response to receipt of the signal from the remote control, and means responsive to the maintenance signal for generating an overruling signal for disabling said actuation means. The device comprises means for intermittently actuating and deactuating said receiver to reduce the power consumption thereof and thereby enable the use of a battery as power source. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/05; E03D 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/05 (2006.01); E03D 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/05 (2013.01); E03D 5/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0792971 A1 19970903; EP 0792971 B1 20020123; EP 1160383 A1 20011205; EP 1160383 B1 20060621

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110225

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110225

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69736207

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110225

2011-09-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: N.V. INTERNATIONAL SANITARY WARE-MFG CY S.A. *INTE

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100107

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100225

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2007-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69736207 P 20060803

2006-06-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0792971 P

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

2006-06-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-06-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040617

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020219

2001-12-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 792971

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL