Global Patent Index - EP 1160390 A2

EP 1160390 A2 2001-12-05 - Roof drainage device

Title (en)

Roof drainage device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Dachentwässerung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le drainage de toiture

Publication

EP 1160390 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01105618 A

Priority

DE 10026842 A

Abstract (en)

The device for the draining of water from especially flat roofs has an intake funnel(11) opening out into a drain pipe(12). The funnel has water guide vanes(13) reducing swirling action inside it and are radially installed on the funnel's inside generated surface. The vanes may have any cross sectional form and may be in an odd number. A cover element(14) is provided for the intake funnel and has a pipe connector(15) on its side facing the funnel.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung (10) zur Dachentwässerung, insbesondere für Flachdächer, mit einem in ein Abflussrohr (12) mündenden Einlauftrichter (11), der mindestens ein eine Wirbelbildung im Trichter (11) vermeidendes Wasserleitelement (13) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0409 (2013.01); E04D 2013/0427 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160390 A2 20011205; EP 1160390 A3 20020724; DE 10026842 A1 20020103

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061228

2006-01-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACO STAVEBNI PRVKY K.S.

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI LU NL SE

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030118

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI