Global Patent Index - EP 1160391 A3

EP 1160391 A3 2001-12-19 - Scaffolding plank for wheel chair users

Title (en)

Scaffolding plank for wheel chair users

Title (de)

Auffahrrampe für Rollstuhlfahrer

Title (fr)

Poutre de roulement pour utilisateurs de fauteuils roulants

Publication

EP 1160391 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01113020 A

Priority

DE 10026809 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10026809C1] The approach ramp has a run-on plate (1) supported to be vertically pivotable around a horizontal axis (36). A lifting device (10) in the form of a pneumatic cushion is provided close to the run-on end of the plate and enables the rider to position the plate with the wheelchair located on it to vertically align with the upper edge of the sill (8). The plate is in four sections (3,4,6,7) located one behind the other at a relatively flat angle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/00; A61G 3/06; B60P 1/43; B63B 27/14; B66B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/00 (2006.01); A61G 3/06 (2006.01); A61G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/002 (2013.01); A61G 5/1054 (2016.11); A61G 3/061 (2013.01); A61G 3/063 (2013.01); A61G 5/104 (2013.01); E04F 2011/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10026809 C1 20010927; EP 1160391 A2 20011205; EP 1160391 A3 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-10-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI