Global Patent Index - EP 1160394 A2

EP 1160394 A2 2001-12-05 - Spacer for concrete shuttering

Title (en)

Spacer for concrete shuttering

Title (de)

Abstandhalter für Betonschalung

Title (fr)

Ecarteur pour coffrage de béton

Publication

EP 1160394 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01112784 A

Priority

IT IM20000004 U

Abstract (en)

Cross strut (1) suitable for maintaining a distance between two facing panels (2) of a box caisson (3), the cross strut comprising a central body (5) which is suitable for being inserted inside a wall (6) realised for packing the box caisson (3) itself and two longitudinal peripheral sections (7) which are arranged on either side of the central body (5) and which are each suitable for extending outside the relative panel (2); whereby the cross strut comprises barraging means (11) which are arranged around and integral to the central body (5) between the peripheral sections (7) in order to block the movement of any kind of liquid along a longer longitudinal axis (A) of the cross strut (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 17/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 17/0721 (2013.01); E04G 2017/0646 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160394 A2 20011205; EP 1160394 A3 20040128; IT 251617 Y1 20031218; IT IM20000004 U1 20011129; IT IM20000004 V0 20000529

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040729

2004-11-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI