Global Patent Index - EP 1160398 A1

EP 1160398 A1 2001-12-05 - Electrically operated lock

Title (en)

Electrically operated lock

Title (de)

Elektrisch betätigbares Schloss

Title (fr)

Serrure à commande électrique

Publication

EP 1160398 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00710006 A

Priority

EP 00710006 A

Abstract (en)

The lock has a latch (4) displaced along a guide (3) in the lock housing (1), with a blocking element (8) moved into a locking position for preventing the release of the latch. An electric drive (13) is coupled to an operating mechanism (10) which has 2 operating ranges, used for operation of the blocking element and the latch via respective coupling devices (17,17a), with emergency release of the lock via an emergency release device mechanically coupled to the operating mechanism.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird ein elektrisch betätigbares Schloß mit a) einen mittels einer gehäusefesten Führung (3) in einem Schloßgehäuse (1) geführten Riegel (4), b) ein in dem Schloßgehäuse (1) gelagertes, von einer Sperrstellung in eine Entsperrstellung betätigbares Sperrelement (8), welches das Schloß in der Sperrstellung gegen Öffnung blockiert, c) ein in dem Schloßgehäuse (1) gelagertes Betätigungsteil (10), welches durch einen elektrischen Antrieb (13) über zwei Bewegungsbereiche betätigbar ist, d) eine erste Kopplungseinrichtung (17), welche das Betätigungsteil (10) in dessen erstem Bewegungsbereich mit dem Sperrelement (8) koppelt, e) eine zweite Kopplungseinrichtung (17a), welche das Betätigungsteil (10) in dessen zweitem Bewegungsbereich mit dem Riegel (4) koppelt und f) eine in dem Schloßgehäuse (1) angeordnete, mit dem Betätigungsteil (10) mechanisch in Eingriff bringbare Notentriegelung (33). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 15/004 (2013.01); E05B 2047/002 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0026 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0086 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160398 A1 20011205; EP 1160398 B1 20040901; AT 275228 T 20040915; AT 310137 T 20051215; DE 50007618 D1 20041007; DE 50108058 D1 20051222

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007618

- Representative's name: RAUSCH WANISCHECK-BERGMANN BRINKMANN PARTNERSC, DE

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 275228 T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG#PARKSTRASSE 11#42579 HEILIGENHAUS (DE) -TRANSFER TO- STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG#PARKSTRASSE 11#42579 HEILIGENHAUS (DE)

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007618 P 20041007

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011214

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI