Global Patent Index - EP 1160399 A1

EP 1160399 A1 2001-12-05 - Electrically actuated lock

Title (en)

Electrically actuated lock

Title (de)

Elektrisch betätigbares Schloss

Title (fr)

Serrure commandée électriquement

Publication

EP 1160399 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01105966 A

Priority

  • EP 01105966 A
  • EP 00710006 A

Abstract (en)

The lock has a latch (4) displaced along a guide (3) in the lock housing (1) via an electric drive (13), with a mechanical emergency release device (33) for the latch. The emergency release device is blocked via an electrically-operated blocking device (43) with an electromagnetically-operated blocking element (50).

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird ein elektrisch betätigbares Schloß mit einem in einem Schloßgehäuse (1) geführten, mittels eines elektrischen Antriebs (13) betätigbaren Riegel (4) sowie einer dem elektrischen Antrieb (13) überlagerten, mechanisch arbeitenden Notentriegelung (33) für den Riegel. Zur Vorbeugung gegenüber Mißbrauch ist die Notentriegelung (33) mittels einer elektrischen betätigbaren Sperreinrichtung (43) sperrbar. Durch die Sperreinrichtung (43) ist vorzugsweise ein Schließwerk (39) oder Teile davon sperrbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/02 (2006.01); E05B 47/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/026 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 47/0603 (2013.01); E05B 15/004 (2013.01); E05B 47/0002 (2013.01); E05B 2047/002 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0026 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0086 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160399 A1 20011205; EP 1160399 B1 20051116

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108058

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108058

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130310

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 310137 T

- Effective date: 20130310

2013-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG#PARKSTRASSE 11#42579 HEILIGENHAUS (DE) -TRANSFER TO- STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG#PARKSTRASSE 11#42579 HEILIGENHAUS (DE)

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108058 P 20051222

2005-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020323

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI