Global Patent Index - EP 1160406 A2

EP 1160406 A2 2001-12-05 - Hinge with notched supporting surface

Title (en)

Hinge with notched supporting surface

Title (de)

Gelenkband mit gekerbter Stützfläche

Title (fr)

Charnière avec surface d'appui encochée

Publication

EP 1160406 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113724 A

Priority

DE 20010009 U

Abstract (en)

The hinge comprising two halves (1) joinable to one another by means of a bolt and support rings (8) with shaped contact surfaces (10) is characterized in that at least one of the support rings on one of the components is rotatable and fixable in place by means of a screw element.

Abstract (de)

Gelenkband für Türen oder Fenster, insbesondere für Glas- oder Acrylglas-Pendeltüren, mit zwei Bandteilen (1,3), die um einen Achsbolzen (7) scharnierend miteinander verbunden sind und jeweils einen den Achsbolzen (7) umgebenden Stützring (8,18) aufweisen, wobei die Stützringe (8,18) aufeinanderliegende Stützflächen (9,19) mit einerseits mindestens einer Einkerbung (20) und andererseits mindestens einem Vorsprung (10) aufweisen, der in einer Drehstellung in die Einkerbung (20) hineinragt und beim Verdrehen der Bandteile aus der Einkerbung (20) herausgehoben wird. Um die Schwenkstellung der Tür oder des Fensterflügels beliebig einstellen zu können, ist mindestens einer der Stützringe (8,18) an einem Bandteil (1,3) drehbar gehalten und mittels eines Schraubelements (17,23) an diesem Bandteil (1,3) in Drehrichtung arretierbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/10; E05F 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01); E05F 1/06 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 1/063 (2013.01); A47K 3/36 (2013.01); E05D 5/0246 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/672 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

DE 19650604 A1 19980610 - KIENLE & CO GLASDESIGN GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20010009 U1 20000817; EP 1160406 A2 20011205; EP 1160406 A3 20050713; EP 2284342 A2 20110216

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120918

2008-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080218

2006-04-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060112

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-07-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-07-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05D 11/10 A

2005-07-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05F 1/06 B

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI