Global Patent Index - EP 1160415 A1

EP 1160415 A1 2001-12-05 - Control device for motor driven darkening systems with program selection

Title (en)

Control device for motor driven darkening systems with program selection

Title (de)

Steuerung für motorisierte Verdunkelungsvorrichtungen mit Programmwahl

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de systèmes d'occultation motorisés à choix de programme

Publication

EP 1160415 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401213 A

Priority

FR 0006104 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2808834A1] The control (120) determines supply to a motor (130) and has an input (PH2) that can be switched to programming mode by connection to an electrical supply line (PH1), and has a timer to measure the duration of the connection to allow the user to choose a menu from a number of predefined stored menus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/68 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160415 A1 20011205; EP 1160415 B1 20070912; DE 60130400 D1 20071025; DE 60130400 T2 20080612; FR 2808834 A1 20011116; FR 2808834 B1 20020809

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080613

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080602

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60130400 P 20071025

2007-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020513

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI