Global Patent Index - EP 1160433 A2

EP 1160433 A2 2001-12-05 - Potentiometer arrangement for a combustion engine

Title (en)

Potentiometer arrangement for a combustion engine

Title (de)

Potentiometeranordnung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Arrangement d'un potentiomètre pour moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 1160433 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01106996 A

Priority

DE 10026410 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has slider elements (10), which are fixed to a shaft (1) with the organ to be adjusted. The slider elements contact stationary resistance tracks (7). The slider elements and the resistance tracks are arranged in a potentiometer space (12). The potentiometer space is formed from a casing wall part (5) and a cover element (11). The slider element is arranged on a slider arm (9) fixed to the shaft. The resistance track and its associated electric conductor tracks (14) are arranged in either the casing wall part or the cover element. The cover element has a seal (13), which seals the potentiometer space.

Abstract (de)

Potentiometeranordnung für eine Brennkraftmaschine, zur Steuerung von auf einer Welle angeordneten Verstellorganen wie z. B. Luftansaugkanälen eines Saugrohres, Drosselklappen etc., mit fest mit der Welle verbundenen Schleiferelementen, die mit stationär angeordneten Widerstandsbahnen in Kontakt stehen, wobei sowohl die Schleiferelemente als auch die Widerstandsbahnen in einem Potentiometerraum angeordnet sind, wobei der Potentiometerraum (12) aus einem Gehäusewandteilstück (5) und einem damit verbindbaren Deckelelement (11) gebildet ist, wobei die Schleiferelemente (10) auf einen fest auf der Welle (1) fixierten Schleiferarm (9) angeordnet sind und die Widerstandsbahnen (7) sowie die zugehörigen elektrischen Leiterbahnen (13) in dem Gehäusewandteilstück (5) oder dem Deckelelement (11) angeordnet sind und wobei das Deckelelement (11) ein Dichtelement (13) aufweist, daß den Potentiometerraum (12) abdichtet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/106 (2013.01); F02D 9/02 (2013.01); F02D 9/10 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0294 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 8422232 U1 19851121

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160433 A2 20011205; EP 1160433 A3 20021106; EP 1160433 B1 20060719; DE 10026410 A1 20011206; DE 50110480 D1 20060831

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070321

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070321

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061030

2006-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110480 P 20060831

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040915

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIERBURG GMBH

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI