Global Patent Index - EP 1160441 A2

EP 1160441 A2 2001-12-05 - Intake pipe with support function

Title (en)

Intake pipe with support function

Title (de)

Ansaugrohr mit Trägerwirkung

Title (fr)

Conduit d'admission ayant une fonction de support

Publication

EP 1160441 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113136 A

Priority

DE 10027438 A

Abstract (en)

The suction pipe(2) is fastened directly to a frame(8) on the vehicle, and another element or assembly such as the driver's cab mounting or air filter mounting is built on, and for this purpose a corresponding holder(26) is provided. The engine side end(12) of the suction pipe has a radially downwards extending connecting plate(14) with two eyes(16) and which is connected to the side of the frame facing away from the engine. The eyes accommodate fastening screws which pass through the engine mounting and through-holes in the frame.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Nutzfahrzeug mit einem Ansaugrohr (2) zur Führung von Verbrennungsluft zwischen einem Luftfilter (4) und den Brennräumen einer Brennkraftmaschine. Die Erfindung sieht vor, dass das Ansaugrohr (2) unmittelbar an einem Nutzfahrzeugrahmen (8) befestigt ist und weitere Bauelemente oder Baugruppen wie beispielsweise das Fahrerhaus oder den Luftfilter (4) trägt und zu diesem Zweck mit entsprechenden Aufnahmen (26, 36) versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10144 (2013.01); F02M 35/164 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19756985 C1 19990304 - DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160441 A2 20011205; EP 1160441 A3 20030102; EP 1160441 B1 20040811; DE 10027438 A1 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN TRUCK & BUS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80995 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50103187

- Effective date: 20110518

2011-05-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2011-05-18 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110420

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-05-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103187 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02M 35/10 A, 7F 02M 35/04 B, 7F 02M 35/16 B

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI