Global Patent Index - EP 1160443 A3

EP 1160443 A3 2002-11-27 - Air intake device for a combustion engine

Title (en)

Air intake device for a combustion engine

Title (de)

Luftzuführungseinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'admission d'air pour moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 1160443 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01110536 A

Priority

DE 10027426 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1160443A2] The air inlet system for an internal combustion engine has a receptacle(18) through which air passes to influence resonances located in a pipe(14) between an air filter and the air feed unit. The pipe is broken in the region of the receptacle, and a cross section(QB) of the receptacle is larger than the cross section(QR) of sections(20,21) of the pipe leading to the receptacle and connected to its end walls(24,25). The pipe in the region of the receptacle has a curved progression(Vb), and the receptacle has an approximate trapezoidal cross section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/12; F02M 35/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/24 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/12 (2006.01); F02M 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/243 (2013.01); F02M 35/1233 (2013.01); F02M 35/021 (2013.01); F02M 35/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160443 A2 20011205; EP 1160443 A3 20021127; EP 1160443 B1 20050810; DE 10027426 A1 20011213; DE 10027426 B4 20061214; JP 2002004963 A 20020109; US 2002033159 A1 20020321; US 6508219 B2 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171103

2017-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50107016

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160405

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120428

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120428

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080428

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051128

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50107016 P 20050915

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02M 35/12 A, 7F 02M 35/10 B

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI