Global Patent Index - EP 1160444 A2

EP 1160444 A2 2001-12-05 - Fuel pump module

Title (en)

Fuel pump module

Title (de)

Brennstoffpumpenmodul

Title (fr)

Module de pompe à carburant

Publication

EP 1160444 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01112717 A

Priority

  • JP 2000158390 A
  • JP 2001081258 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel pump module is provided which reduces the number of parts thereof and has strong resistance to vibrations caused by driving a vehicle. The fuel pump module, having a reservoir formed in an inner surface of a lower case, a fuel passage for guiding to an engine the fuel accommodated in the reservoir, a pressure regulator held in the lower case to regulate fuel pressure of the fuel flowing through the fuel passage, and an upper case capped on the lower case, comprises an installing portion provided on the inner surface of the lower case and inside the reservoir, and a pressing portion provided inside the upper case to project therefrom as corresponding to the installing portion. The pressure regulator is sandwiched between the installing portion and the pressing portion. The auxiliary passage for locking the installing portion to both of the fuel passage and the strainer for fuel cleaning is provided. Return fuel from the held and fixed pressure regulator is returned to the reservoir. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/04 (2006.01); F02M 37/10 (2006.01); F02M 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/103 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160444 A2 20011205; EP 1160444 A3 20020522; EP 1160444 B1 20050302; CN 1298989 C 20070207; CN 1327123 A 20011219; JP 2002054520 A 20020220

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090525

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-04-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2005-03-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FUEL PUMP MODULE

2004-01-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031118

2003-11-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-08-07 [DX] MISCELLANEOUS: (DELETED)

2002-06-12 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI