Global Patent Index - EP 1160446 A2

EP 1160446 A2 2001-12-05 - "Fuel pump module"

Title (en)

"Fuel pump module"

Title (de)

Brennstoffpumpenmodul

Title (fr)

Module de pompe à carburant

Publication

EP 1160446 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01112720 A

Priority

JP 2000158391 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel pump module is prevented which can be miniaturized, and handled economically with low costs even if some parts therein fail. The fuel pump module comprises a pumping functional portion having only pump function and pumping fuel accommodated in a reservoir, a strainer linked to the pumping functional portion via a first fuel passage, a backflow-preventing functional portion attached to the first fuel passage and preventing backflow of fuel which flows through the first fuel passage, a second fuel passage for guiding the fuel from the strainer to an engine, and a pressure-regulating functional portion connected to the second fuel passage and keeping fuel pressure in the second fuel passage constant, wherein the pumping functional portion, the backflow-preventing functional portion, and the pressure-regulating functional portion are again integrated into one after being divided per a single function. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/10 (2006.01); F02M 69/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/103 (2013.01); F02M 2037/228 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160446 A2 20011205; EP 1160446 A3 20020522; EP 1160446 B1 20040421; CN 1327124 A 20011219; JP 2001336461 A 20011207; JP 4410384 B2 20100203

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090525

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-03-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-03-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI