Global Patent Index - EP 1160456 A2

EP 1160456 A2 2001-12-05 - Scroll compressor

Title (en)

Scroll compressor

Title (de)

Spiralverdichter

Title (fr)

Compresseur à spirales

Publication

EP 1160456 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01107882 A

Priority

US 58432300 A

Abstract (en)

A tipseal assembly for a rotary scroll compressor is disclosed. The rotary scroll compressor has a stationary scroll element with a stationary spiral flange and an orbiting scroll element with an orbiting spiral flange. An orbital drive mechanism drives the orbiting scroll element in an orbit about the stationary scroll element, and a non-rotation bearing device maintains the orbiting scroll element substantially non-rotational with respect to the stationary scroll element. The stationary and orbiting spiral flanges are intermeshed and nested with one another to form at least one spiraling compression pocket therebetween. The tipseal assembly forms a substantially airtight seal between at least one of the stationary and orbiting spiral flanges and the base of the other scroll element. The tipseal assembly includes an inwardly extending groove formed in an end surface of at least one of the stationary and orbiting spiral flanges, a compressible element disposed within and along the groove and a tipseal overlaying the compressible element. Preferably, the tipseal element extends beyond the end surface when the compressible element is in an uncompressed state, the tipseal element includes at least one of a non-metallic substance, a fluorosint material and a PTFE based product and the compressible element includes at least one of an elastomeric material, a silicone rubber material and a high temperature resistant O-ring material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/02; F04C 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/02 (2006.01); F04C 27/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 27/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160456 A2 20011205; EP 1160456 A3 20030402; AU 2814301 A 20011206; BR 0101609 A 20020423; CA 2325752 A1 20011201; JP 2002005056 A 20020109; MX PA01005260 A 20050617; ZA 200102885 B 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050610

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI