Global Patent Index - EP 1160504 A1

EP 1160504 A1 2001-12-05 - Process to adapt a headlamp low beam to the opposite driving side, device, template and headlamp for the implementation of such process

Title (en)

Process to adapt a headlamp low beam to the opposite driving side, device, template and headlamp for the implementation of such process

Title (de)

Verfahren um den Abblendlichtstrahl eines Scheinwerfers an den Gegenverkehr anzupassen, Vorrichtung, Schablone und Scheinwerfer um dieses Verfahren durchzufÜhren

Title (fr)

Procédé pour adapter un faisceau de projecteur de croisement à un sens de circulation inverse, dispositif, gabarit et projecteur pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1160504 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01400959 A

Priority

FR 0007189 A

Abstract (en)

The headlamp beam adjustment is implemented with translucent screens (10) placed over the front glass of the headlamp. The translucent screens deflect light emerging from the headlamp, deflecting downward the part of the emerging beam that is aimed above the horizontal. The low beam is also deflected to a more forward direction. Independent claims are also included for an adaptation device, a template for the headlamp screen and the headlamp fitted with the adaptation device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; F21V 5/02; F21V 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 41/62 (2018.01); F21S 41/28 (2018.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160504 A1 20011205; EP 1160504 B1 20061227; DE 60125459 D1 20070208; DE 60125459 T2 20071031; ES 2278706 T3 20070816; FR 2809799 A1 20011207; FR 2809799 B1 20020816

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140414

2015-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150526

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140413

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140413

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60125459

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140413

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60125459

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130415

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130409

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2278706 T3

2007-02-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070207

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60125459 P 20070208

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2006-12-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI