Global Patent Index - EP 1160505 A1

EP 1160505 A1 2001-12-05 - Process to adapt an elliptical headlamp low beam to the opposite driving side, device, template and headlamp for the implementation of such process

Title (en)

Process to adapt an elliptical headlamp low beam to the opposite driving side, device, template and headlamp for the implementation of such process

Title (de)

Verfahren um den Abblendlichtstrahl eines elliptischen Scheinwerfers an den Gegenverkehr anzupassen, Vorrichtung, Schablone und Scheinwerfer um dieses Verfahren auszuführen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour adapter un faisceau de croisement de projecteur elliptique à un sens de circulation inverse, dispositif, gabarit et projecteur pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1160505 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01400962 A

Priority

FR 0007188 A

Abstract (en)

The headlamp beam adjustment is implemented with translucent screens (10) placed over the front glass (G) of the headlamp. The position of the screen is determined by locating the region of the headlamp glass through which the part of the beam above the horizontal passes. The translucent screen is placed on this region, deflecting downward the part of the beam aimed above the horizontal. Independent claims are also included for the adjusting assembly, the stencil to place on the glass and the projector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; F21V 5/02; F21V 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 41/62 (2018.01); F21S 41/28 (2018.01); F21S 41/55 (2018.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160505 A1 20011205; EP 1160505 B1 20070110; DE 60125863 D1 20070222; DE 60125863 T2 20071025; ES 2280323 T3 20070916; FR 2809798 A1 20011207; FR 2809798 B1 20021129

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130414

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130413

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60125863

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130413

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130413

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120416

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071011

2007-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2280323 T3

2007-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070222

2007-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60125863 P 20070222

2007-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-01-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI