Global Patent Index - EP 1160506 A2

EP 1160506 A2 2001-12-05 - Vehicle headlamp of the projection type and lighting device comprising at least one such a headlamp

Title (en)

Vehicle headlamp of the projection type and lighting device comprising at least one such a headlamp

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge nach dem Projektionsprinzip und Beleuchtungseinrichtug mit wenigstens einem solchen Scheinwerfer

Title (fr)

Projecteur du genre elliptique pour véhicules et dispositif d' éclairage avec au moins un tel projecteur

Publication

EP 1160506 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01111391 A

Priority

DE 10027018 A

Abstract (en)

The headlamp has a light source (20) with a reflector (22) reflecting light from the source as a beam and a screen (24) opaque to visible light for producing the light/dark boundary of emitted visible light followed by a lens (30) via which reflected light passes. The screen is at least partly transparent to infrared light in at least one area. Infrared light passing through the screen has a greater range than visible light passing round it. Independent claims are also included for the following: an illumination device with at least one headlamp.

Abstract (de)

Der Scheinwerfer weist eine Lichtquelle (20) auf, einen Reflektor (22), durch den von der Lichtquelle (20) ausgesandtes Licht als ein Lichtbündel reflektiert wird, eine im Strahlengang des vom Reflektor (22) reflektierten Lichtbündels angeordnete Abschirmvorrichtung (24), die für Licht im sichtbaren Wellenlängenbereich undurchlässig ist und durch die eine Helldunkelgrenze (83,84) des aus dem Scheinwerfer (10) austretenden Lichts im sichtbaren Wellenlängenbereich erzeugt wird, und eine in Lichtaustrittsrichtung (28) nach der Abschirmvorrichtung (24) angeordnete Linse (30), durch die vom Reflektor (22) reflektiertes Licht hindurchtritt. Die Abschirmvorrichtung (24) ist wenigstens bereichsweise für Licht in infrarotem Wellenlängenbereich zumindest teilweise durchlässig und durch die Abschirmvorrichtung (24) hindurchtretendes Licht in infrarotem Wellenlängenbereich weist eine größere Reichweite auf als das an der Abschirmvorrichtung (24) vorbeigelangende Licht im sichtbaren Wellenlängenbereich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/12; F21V 9/04; B60Q 1/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60Q 1/14 (2006.01); B60Q 1/04 (2006.01); F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21S 8/12 (2006.01); F21S 10/02 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 9/04 (2006.01); F21V 9/08 (2006.01); F21V 9/14 (2006.01); F21V 11/00 (2006.01); F21V 13/00 (2006.01); F21V 14/00 (2006.01); F21V 14/08 (2006.01); F21W 101/10 (2006.01); F21Y 101/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 9/14 (2013.01); F21S 41/13 (2018.01); F21S 41/255 (2018.01); F21S 41/285 (2018.01); F21S 41/321 (2018.01); F21S 41/36 (2018.01); F21S 41/43 (2018.01); F21S 41/60 (2018.01); F21S 41/635 (2018.01); F21S 41/689 (2018.01); F21V 9/04 (2013.01); F21S 41/162 (2018.01); F21S 41/17 (2018.01); F21W 2102/00 (2018.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160506 A2 20011205; EP 1160506 A3 20040324; EP 1160506 B1 20060809; DE 10027018 A1 20011206; DE 10027018 B4 20100909; DE 50110661 D1 20060921; JP 2002008415 A 20020111; JP 4838444 B2 20111214; US 2002001198 A1 20020103; US 6467940 B2 20021022

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-28 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50110661

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F21S0008120000

- IPC: F21S0041000000

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150510

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150510

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150510

2014-10-09 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50110661

- Effective date: 20140819

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140516

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-19 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50110661

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-11-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110661 P 20060921

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-08-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040924

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI