Global Patent Index - EP 1160515 A2

EP 1160515 A2 2001-12-05 - Heating installation with at least two heating circuits

Title (en)

Heating installation with at least two heating circuits

Title (de)

Heizungsanlage mit mindestens zwei Heizkreisen

Title (fr)

Installation de chauffage avec au moins deux circuits de chauffage

Publication

EP 1160515 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01106999 A

Priority

DE 10027656 A

Abstract (en)

A bypass line (40) connected between heating flow- and return lines (16, 18) includes a sensor (42). To maintain a required temperature difference between flow- and return lines, the heating unit pump (22) is controlled in accordance with sensor measurements.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Heizungsanlage mit mindestens zwei Heizkreisen (24, 27) vorgeschlagen. Die Heizungsanlage umfaßt ein Heizgerät (10) mit einer Heizgerätepumpe (22), einem Heizungsvorlauf (16) und einem Heizungsrücklauf (18), wobei zwischen Heizungsvorlauf (16) und Heizungsrücklauf (18) Heizwasser zirkuliert und wobei eine Temperaturdifferenz zwischen der Vorlauftemperatur und der Rücklauftemperatur des Heizwassers einstellbar ist. Dazu ist vorgesehen, zwischen Heizungsrücklauf (18) und Heizungsvorlauf (16) eine Bypassleitung (40) mit einem Meßwertaufnehmer (42) anzuordnen und die Heizgerätepumpe (22) in Abhängigkeit vom Meßsignals des Meßwertaufnehmers (42) derart zu regeln, daß die Temperaturdifferenz zwischen dem Heizungsvorlauf (16) und dem Heizungsrücklauf (18) im Wesentlichen gehalten wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/1012 (2013.01); F24D 19/1066 (2013.01); Y02B 30/745 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160515 A2 20011205; EP 1160515 A3 20030409; EP 1160515 B1 20050406; DE 10027656 A1 20011213

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50105802

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150321

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150321

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140320

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-07 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50105802

- Effective date: 20121205

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050712

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50105802 P 20050512

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI