Global Patent Index - EP 1160520 A2

EP 1160520 A2 2001-12-05 - Heat generator with two burners and a heat exchanger

Title (en)

Heat generator with two burners and a heat exchanger

Title (de)

Wärmeerzeuger mit zwei Brennern und einem Wärmeübertrager

Title (fr)

Generateur de chaleur avec deux brûleurs et un echangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1160520 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01111752 A

Priority

DE 10027652 A

Abstract (en)

The boiler comprises a common heat exchanger (30) and two burners (10, 20). They occupy individual combustion chambers (11, 21) and are designed for different heating outputs. They heat different regions (30.1, 30.2) of the common heat exchanger, and/or are directed in different directions onto these regions. Burner heat output and heat exchanger region heated, are individually imatched. In accordance with heating demand, first- and/or second burners are brought into operation.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wärmeerzeuger mit zwei Brennern und einem Wärmeübertrager, wobei die Brenner den Wärmeübertrager mit Wärme versorgen, um die durch den Wärmeübertrager fließende Flüssigkeit zu erwärmen. Um einen hohen Modulationsgrad für die Heizleistung bei kompakter Bauweise des Wärmeerzeugers zu erreichen, sieht die Erfindung vor, dass dem Wärmeübertrager neben dem ersten Brenner in einer einzigen Brennkammer ein zweiter Brenner zugeordnet ist, die auf unterschiedliche Heizleistungen ausgelegt sind und auf verschiedene, auf diese Heizleistungen angepasste Teilbereiche des gemeinsamen Wärmeübertragers und/oder in unterschiedlichen Richtungen auf diese Teilbereiche einwirken, und dass in Abhängigkeit von dem Heizleistungsbedarf der erste Brenner und/oder der zweite Brenner in Betrieb setzbar ist (sind). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02G 1/043 (2006.01); F24H 1/00 (2006.01); F24H 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/00 (2013.01); F02G 1/043 (2013.01); F02G 2254/10 (2013.01); F24D 2200/043 (2013.01); F24H 1/40 (2013.01); F24H 2240/04 (2013.01); F24H 2240/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160520 A2 20011205; EP 1160520 A3 20030723; DE 10027652 A1 20011213

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070123

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050825

2004-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI