Global Patent Index - EP 1160521 A2

EP 1160521 A2 2001-12-05 - Boiler

Title (en)

Boiler

Title (de)

Heizkessel

Title (fr)

Chaudiére

Publication

EP 1160521 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01111602 A

Priority

DE 10026549 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10026549C1] The coil (1) through which water is passed is compressible over a distance (D) against a fixed counter-bearing (8) in the burner casing (7). Spacer elements between the coil turns (4) define a narrow flow gap (6) for hot gases to pass through. The heat exchanger is located inside a burner chamber.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Heizkessel, bestehend aus einer mit Vor- und Rücklaufanschlüssen (2,3) versehenen, ein Wärmeträgermedium führenden Rohrwendel (1), die mit ihren Gängen (4) einen schraubenlinienförmigen, durch Distanzhalteelemente definierten, engen Durchströmspalt (6) begrenzt und die, die Brennkammer (21) umschließend, in einem das Heizmedium führenden Gehäuse (7) angeordnet ist. Um einen derartigen Heizkessel ohne großen Umstellungsaufwand zum einen als Heizwert- und zum anderen auch als Brennwertkessel betreiben und auch problemlos reinigen zu können ist erfindungsgemäß die Rohrwendel (1) federnd und auf Spaltdistanz (D) gegen ein stationäres Widerlager (8) des Gehäuses (7) zusammenspann- und entspannbar ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/28; F24H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/28 (2006.01); F24H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/43 (2013.01); F24H 9/0042 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9416272 A1 19940721 - LE MER JOSEPH [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160521 A2 20011205; EP 1160521 A3 20030507; EP 1160521 B1 20060322; AT 321249 T 20060415; DE 10026549 C1 20011122; DE 50109256 D1 20060511

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VIESSMANN WERKE G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060512

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109256 P 20060511

2006-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO DR. URS FALK

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2006-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2004-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VIESSMANN WERKE GMBH & CO KG

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI