Global Patent Index - EP 1160740 A1

EP 1160740 A1 2001-12-05 - Stacking device for banknotes in automatic machines for payment of goods and services, with banknote identifier

Title (en)

Stacking device for banknotes in automatic machines for payment of goods and services, with banknote identifier

Title (de)

Stapelvorrichtung für Banknoten in automatischen Maschinen für Zahlung von Waren und Diensten, mit Banknotenechtheitsprüfer

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'empilage de billets de banque dans les machines automatiques de paiement de marchandises et de services, avec dispositif de validation de billets de banque

Publication

EP 1160740 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00830389 A

Priority

EP 00830389 A

Abstract (en)

This invention concerns a stacking device for banknotes that can be applied to a banknote identifier, consisting of a body (15), a storage drawer (18), a channel (19) placed above the drawer and designed to receive each banknote recognised by the identifier, a support surface (20) placed between the receiving channel (19) and the storage drawer (18), dragging devices (23) designed to move each banknote from the channel to the support surface, and a pusher (29) which moves perpendicularly to said support surface in order to transfer each banknote from the support surface to the storage drawer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/202 (2013.01); G07D 11/0012 (2013.01); G07F 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160740 A1 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-04 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060419

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050120

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020309

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI