Global Patent Index - EP 1160741 A2

EP 1160741 A2 2001-12-05 - Device for recognition of coins and the like

Title (en)

Device for recognition of coins and the like

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erkennung von Münzen und ähnlichem

Title (fr)

Appareil de reconnaissance de pièces et équivalents

Publication

EP 1160741 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01109464 A

Priority

IT MI20000973 A

Abstract (en)

A device for the recognition of coins and the like, comprising two parallel walls (2,3) which are arranged side by side so as to form a path for the passage of at least one coin, at least one of the walls having lighting means (5) which are adapted to illuminate the path of the at least one coin, the opposite wall being provided with optical sensor means (6) and with inductive sensor means (7) in order to determine respectively a sequence of measurements of chords of the at least one coin and a sequence of inductive measurements obtained from the coin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/02 (2006.01); G07D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/02 (2013.01); G07D 5/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160741 A2 20011205; EP 1160741 A3 20030129; IT 1317457 B1 20030709; IT MI20000973 A1 20011105; IT MI20000973 D0 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-31 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050707

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 1/04 A

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07D 5/02 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 3/02 B

2002-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VESIEL S.P.A.

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI