Global Patent Index - EP 1160749 A2

EP 1160749 A2 2001-12-05 - Entertainment machines

Title (en)

Entertainment machines

Title (de)

Unterhaltungsautomaten

Title (fr)

Machines d'amusement

Publication

EP 1160749 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01304170 A

Priority

GB 0011366 A

Abstract (en)

An entertainment machine has a main display at which symbols are selected, and displayed on a win line (50), using rotatable symbol-bearing reels (9). There is also a supplementary display (15) which comprises a back-illuminated matrix (17) of rectangular zones (18) arranged in mutually perpendicular rows and columns. Transfer symbols (32) on the reels (9) indicate direction of movement, and number of zones of movement, through the matrix, such movement being made available when the transfer symbols (32) are displayed on the win line (50). The transfer symbols (32) may comprise arrows and numbers and may be provided alongside, or in place of, main symbols (30). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01); G07F 17/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3265 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3244 (2013.01); G07F 17/3267 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160749 A2 20011205; EP 1160749 A3 20031210; GB 0011366 D0 20000628; GB 0111219 D0 20010627; GB 2364418 A 20020123; GB 2364418 B 20040505

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-24 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050629

2004-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES NL

2004-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040513

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 17/34 A

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 17/32 B

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI