Global Patent Index - EP 1160753 A1

EP 1160753 A1 2001-12-05 - Mobile mission system

Title (en)

Mobile mission system

Title (de)

Mobiles Einsatzsystem

Title (fr)

Système mobile d'intervention

Publication

EP 1160753 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01112300 A

Priority

DE 10027567 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a location device, a data communications device, a computer and a device for automatically evaluating the mission. The location device contains a Global Positioning System or GPS and the data communications device contains a GSM mobile telephone device. The automatic evaluation device contains a device for computing routes using the GPS signal. Independent claims are also included for the following: a method of automatically computing a route using a GPS signal, selecting at least one data element and producing a report using the selected data element and the computed route.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt ein mobiles Einsatzsystem mit einer Ortungseinrichtung, einer Datenfernübertragungseinrichtung, einer Recheneinrichtung und einer Einrichtung zum automatischen Auswerten des Einsatzes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/00; G08G 1/127

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/127 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/127 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0982673 A2 20000301 - TSUBASA SYSTEM CO LTD [JP]
  • [A] US 5432904 A 19950711 - WONG DAVID C [US]
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 02 29 February 2000 (2000-02-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 10 30 November 1995 (1995-11-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160753 A1 20011205; EP 1160753 B1 20090422; DE 10027567 A1 20020613; DE 50114848 D1 20090604

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170513

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100125

2009-06-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114848 P 20090604

2009-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-04-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061218

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011220

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI