Global Patent Index - EP 1160812 A2

EP 1160812 A2 2001-12-05 - Emergency switch for vehicles, in particular for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Emergency switch for vehicles, in particular for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Notrufschalter für Fahrzeuge, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Interrupteur d'urgence pour véhicules, en particulier pour véhicules à moteur

Publication

EP 1160812 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112672 A

Priority

DE 10027445 A

Abstract (en)

The emergency call switch (1) has an operating element (4) for operation of a spring-loaded release (6,7) for activating a pre-programmed communication device, for alerting police or breakdown services in the case of an accident or a breakdown. The operating element is held in its inoperative position via a latch which must be released before the operating element can be moved into the emergency call position.

Abstract (de)

Der Notrufschalter (1) hat einen aus einer Grundstellung verstellbaren Betätigungsteil (4) für einen Auslöser (6, 7). Es ist bekannt, beispielsweise bei einem Unfall oder einer Panne mit einem vorprogrammierten Kommunikationsendgerät bei der Polizei oder einem Pannendienst einen Alarm auszulösen. Um einen Notrufschalter (1) für ein Fahrzeug zu schaffen, mit dem auf einfache Weise ein Notruf ausgelöst werden kann, wobei ein unbeabsichtigtes Betätigen des Schalters einwandfrei vermieden werden soll, ist das Betätigungsteil (4) in seiner Grundstellung gegen Verstellen gesichert. Um den Notruf auszulösen, muß daher zunächst die Verriegelung des Betätigungsteiles (4) aufgehoben und dann das Betätigungsteil in seiner Freigabestellung in die Lage zum Auslösen des Notrufes verstellt werden. Der Notrufschalter eignet sich insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/20 (2006.01); H01H 3/02 (2006.01); H01H 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/20 (2013.01); H01H 3/022 (2013.01); H01H 25/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160812 A2 20011205; EP 1160812 A3 20040303; DE 10027445 A1 20011206

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040904

2004-12-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI