Global Patent Index - EP 1160814 A2

EP 1160814 A2 2001-12-05 - Electric switch structure

Title (en)

Electric switch structure

Title (de)

Elektrische Schalteinrichtung

Title (fr)

Agencement de commutation électrique

Publication

EP 1160814 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01107669 A

Priority

DE 10026352 A

Abstract (en)

The device has an elastic switching mat (4) on a circuit board (1) with at least one hat-shaped switching region (5) raised from the board with an electrically conducting switching bridge (8) on the inner end surface (7) that can be into contact with the conducting track under pressure on the switching region. The switching bridge is formed by a metal plate held by the inner end surface.

Abstract (de)

Eine elektrische Schalteinrichtung hat auf einer Leiterplatte (1) eine elastische Schaltmatte (4) mit einem hutartigen, von der Leiterplatte (1) abgehobenen Schaltbereich (5), der an seiner inneren Stirnfläche (7) eine elektrisch leitende, bei Druck auf den Schaltbereich (5) gegen Leiterbahnen (2, 3) der Leiterplatte (1) bewegliche Schaltbrücke (8) hat. Diese Schaltbrücke (8) ist durch ein von der inneren Stirnfläche (7) gehaltenes Metallplättchen gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2006.01); H01H 13/785 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/785 (2013.01); H01H 13/702 (2013.01); H01H 2201/022 (2013.01); H01H 2205/002 (2013.01); H01H 2221/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160814 A2 20011205; EP 1160814 A3 20041117; EP 1160814 B1 20071128; DE 10026352 A1 20011129; DE 50113309 D1 20080110

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130328

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50113309

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130328

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-07-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2008-05-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VDO AUTOMOTIVE AG

2008-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080213

2008-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113309 P 20080110

2007-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-11-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE AG

2005-08-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050517

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI