Global Patent Index - EP 1160818 A1

EP 1160818 A1 2001-12-05 - CIRCUIT BREAKER

Title (en)

CIRCUIT BREAKER

Title (de)

LEISTUNGSSCHALTER

Title (fr)

COUPE-CIRCUIT

Publication

EP 1160818 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99961477 A

Priority

JP 9907405 W

Abstract (en)

A circuit breaker in which, a stable opening and closing operation can be achieved during the ordinary opening and closing operation or the tipping operation and the isolation function is ensured upon the contact welding. A restriction member 41 is provided for engaging both the handle arm 35 and the cross bar 26 to prevent the movement of the handle 36 into the open position when the stationary contact 22 of the stationary contact member 21 and the movable contact 24 of the movable contact member 23 are welded together and when a handle 36 is moved to the open position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/50 (2006.01); H01H 71/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/501 (2013.01); H01H 71/525 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160818 A1 20011205; EP 1160818 A4 20030402; EP 1160818 B1 20040721; AU 1804500 A 20010709; AU 752069 B2 20020905; DE 69918864 D1 20040826; DE 69918864 T2 20050721; JP 3857139 B2 20061213; WO 0148779 A1 20010705

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-11-16 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-06-15 [REG GB 727B] CASE DECIDED BY THE COMPTROLLER ** SPECIFICATION AMENDED (SECT. 27/1977)

2005-01-26 [REG GB 727A] APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION NOW OPEN TO OPPOSITION (SECT. 27/1977)

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-12-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-12-15 [REG GB 727] APPLICATION MADE FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION (SECT. 27/1977)

2004-11-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69918864 P 20040826

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030428

2003-04-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01H 71/12 A

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01H 71/50 B

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI