Global Patent Index - EP 1160834 A2

EP 1160834 A2 2001-12-05 - Low-pressure mercury discharge lamp with an external tube

Title (en)

Low-pressure mercury discharge lamp with an external tube

Title (de)

Niederdruck-Quecksilber-Entladungslampe mit Au enkolben

Title (fr)

Lampe à décharge à vapeur de mercure à basse pression avec ampoule extérieure

Publication

EP 1160834 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01000191 A

Priority

DE 10026909 A

Abstract (en)

Low pressure mercury discharge lamp consists of an inner bulb forming a gas discharge vessel having a wall made from a material which is permeable for electromagnetic radiation and coated with a phosphor; an outer bulb surrounding the inner bulb and having a wall containing a UV-A phosphor; and devices for producing and maintaining a low pressure mercury gas discharge. Preferred Features: The wall of the outer bulb has a coating containing the UV-A phosphor, or is made from a material containing a polymeric plastic and the UV-A phosphor. The UV-A phosphor is selected from ZnS:Ag; YVO4:Eu; Y(V, P)O4:Eu; Y2O3:Eu; CaSiO3:Ce,Mn; Y2SiO5:Ce,Mn; BaMgAl10O17: Eu, Mn and (Ba, Sr, Ca)5(PO4)3Cl:Eu,Mn.

Abstract (de)

Niederdruck-Quecksilber-Entladungslampe, die mit einem Innenkolben, der ein Gasentladungsgefäß bildet und dessen Wand aus einem Material besteht, das für elektromagnetische Strahlung durchlässig und mit einem Leuchtstoff beschichtet ist, mit einem Außenkolben, der den Innenkolben umgibt, und dessen Wand einen UV-A-Leuchtstoff enthält, und mit Mitteln zur Erzeugung und Aufrechterhaltung einer Niederdruck-Quecksilber-Gasentladung ausgerüstet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/44; H01J 61/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/34 (2006.01); H01J 61/42 (2006.01); H01J 61/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/327 (2013.01); H01J 61/34 (2013.01); H01J 61/42 (2013.01); H01J 61/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160834 A2 20011205; EP 1160834 A3 20030903; EP 1160834 B1 20081008; CN 1222981 C 20051012; CN 1326215 A 20011212; DE 10026909 A1 20011206; DE 50114377 D1 20081120; JP 2002025502 A 20020125; US 2002027420 A1 20020307; US 6888302 B2 20050503

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-09-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090709

2008-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114377 P 20081120

2008-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060620

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JUESTEL, THOMAS,DR., PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUA

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RONDA, CORNELIS,DR. PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUA

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NIKOL, HANS, DR., PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI