Global Patent Index - EP 1160851 A2

EP 1160851 A2 2001-12-05 - Method for fabricating a multilayer semiconductor device

Title (en)

Method for fabricating a multilayer semiconductor device

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer mehrschichtigen Halbleitervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication d'un dispositif semiconducteur multicouche

Publication

EP 1160851 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01112083 A

Priority

JP 2000159707 A

Abstract (en)

Provided is a method for fabricating a compound semiconductor multilayer epitaxial substrate comprising a plurality of epitaxial layers, comprising the steps of determining at least one of the thickness, impurity concentration, and composition of an epitaxial layer comprising the multilayer epitaxial substrate by theoretical calculation, the theoretical calculation describing on electric field and charge distribution inside the epitaxial layer, and performing epitaxy of the epitaxial layer according to the theoretical calculation of the thickness, impurity concentration and/or composition of the epitaxial layer so that measurable electric characteristice of the substrate predetermined by the calculation are satisfied. The method can reduce the fabrication process and also can be applied to manufacture a multilayer epitaxial substrate having a unique structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/335; H01L 29/778

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C30B 29/40 (2006.01); H01L 21/20 (2006.01); H01L 21/205 (2006.01); H01L 21/335 (2006.01); H01L 21/338 (2006.01); H01L 21/66 (2006.01); H01L 29/778 (2006.01); H01L 29/812 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/0262 (2013.01); H01L 21/0237 (2013.01); H01L 21/02395 (2013.01); H01L 21/02463 (2013.01); H01L 21/02505 (2013.01); H01L 21/02546 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160851 A2 20011205; EP 1160851 A3 20060614; JP 2001338884 A 20011207; JP 4757370 B2 20110824; TW I228759 B 20050301; US 2001051382 A1 20011213; US 6569693 B2 20030527

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110210

2007-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061024

2006-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060724

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 21/20 20060101AFI20060509BHEP

2006-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 21/335 20060101ALI20060509BHEP

2006-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 29/778 20060101ALN20060509BHEP

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI